Senate | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 05/27/2016 | May 27 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2016 | Set for hearing May 27. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2016 | April 25 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2016 | Set for hearing April 25. | ||
Senate | 04/13/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3522.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2016 | Set for hearing April 12. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2016 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2016 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |