Senate | 11/30/2016 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Senate | 04/21/2016 | April 20 set for second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 1. Page 3647.) | ||
Senate | 04/19/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2016 | Set for hearing April 20. | ||
Senate | 04/12/2016 | April 11 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2016 | Set for hearing April 11. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2016 | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2016 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |