Senate | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 05/27/2016 | May 27 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2016 | Set for hearing May 27. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2016 | May 16 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2016 | Set for hearing May 16. | ||
Senate | 04/19/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3. Page 3594.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/30/2016 | Set for hearing April 19. | ||
Senate | 03/29/2016 | April 5 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2016 | Set for hearing April 5. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2016 | March 29 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 03/09/2016 | Set for hearing March 29. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2016 | Referred to Com. on E., U., & C. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2016 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |