|
09/23/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 543, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5513.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2016
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6023.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2016
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2016
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2016
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3955.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2016
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2016
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3560.) (April 13).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2016
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|