Senate | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 04/27/2016 | April 26 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 4. Page 3701.) Reconsideration granted. | ||
Senate | 04/14/2016 | Set for hearing April 26. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2016 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2016 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |