Senate | 02/01/2016 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/28/2015 | May 28 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2015 | Set for hearing May 28. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2015 | May 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/12/2015 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2015 | Set for hearing May 18. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2015 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 721.) (April 22). | ||
Senate | 04/17/2015 | Set for hearing April 22. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/05/2015 | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. | ||
Senate | 01/23/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 22. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2015 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |