Senate | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 04/12/2016 | April 12 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Senate | 03/15/2016 | Set for hearing April 12. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2016 | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and JUD. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2016 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |