LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1314
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1314
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1314
Compare Versions
SB1314 Chaptered September 21, 2016
SB1314 Enrolled August 29, 2016
SB1314 Amended August 1, 2016
SB1314 Amended April 19, 2016
SB1314 Amended April 6, 2016
SB1314 Introduced February 19, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
SB1314 Chaptered September 21, 2016
SB1314 Enrolled August 29, 2016
SB1314 Amended August 1, 2016
SB1314 Amended April 19, 2016
SB1314 Amended April 6, 2016
SB1314 Introduced February 19, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare