California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1315 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 07/01/2016

 BILL NUMBER: SB 1315CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 56 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE JULY 1, 2016 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR JULY 1, 2016 PASSED THE SENATE APRIL 14, 2016 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY JUNE 23, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 7, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 28, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Senator Bates FEBRUARY 19, 2016 An act to amend Section 29064 of the Government Code, relating to local government. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 1315, Bates. Counties: budgets. Existing law requires the board of supervisors of a county to approve a recommended budget, including revisions, on or before June 30 of each year, as specified. This bill would authorize the board of supervisors of a county to direct the publication of a recommended budget for the purpose of conducting a budget hearing without authorizing spending pursuant to the recommended budget until the budget is adopted. The bill would require the board of supervisors to follow specific procedures for the adoption of a budget under these provisions, including, among other requirements, conducting a hearing on the recommended budget on or before June 20 and adopting the budget on or before June 30 of each year in which the board elects to utilize these provisions. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 29064 of the Government Code is amended to read: 29064. (a) Except as provided in subdivision (c), on or before June 30 of each year the board, by formal action, shall approve the recommended budget, including the revisions it deems necessary for the purpose of having authority to spend until the budget is adopted. (b) (1) Except as provided in paragraph (2), the board may make revisions to the recommended budget until the budget is adopted pursuant to Article 4 (commencing with Section 29080). (2) A revision to the recommended budget after the start of the public hearing held pursuant to Article 4 (commencing with Section 29080) shall be made only if the revision is proposed in writing and filed with the clerk of the board prior to the close of the public hearing, or approved by a four-fifths vote of the board after the close of the hearing. (c) (1) In lieu of approving the recommended budget pursuant to subdivision (a), the board may, subject to the following conditions, direct the publication of a recommended budget for the purpose of conducting a budget hearing without authorizing spending pursuant to the recommended budget until the budget is adopted: (A) On or before May 30, the board shall make the recommended budget available to the public. (B) On or before May 30, the board shall publish a notice stating that the recommended budget is available to members of the public, and that the board will conduct a public hearing on the recommended budget, including the time and place of that hearing. (C) On or before June 20, but not fewer than 10 days after the recommended budget is made available to the public, the board shall conduct the public hearing on the recommended budget. (D) After the conclusion of the hearing on the recommended budget, and not later than June 30, the board shall adopt the budget by resolution pursuant to the requirements of Article 4 (commencing with Section 29080). (2) On or before May 30 of each year in which the board utilizes the procedures authorized by this subdivision, the board shall set forth a proposed budget adoption schedule that complies with the requirements of paragraph (1).