Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From Assembly without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From committee without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2016
|
June 28 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2016
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 5473.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on W., P., & W. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 17. Page 4146.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2016
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2016
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3609.) (April 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2016
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 3495.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2016
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2016
|
March 29 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2016
|
Set for hearing March 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|