Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From Assembly without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From committee without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 4147.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 3935.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2016
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
May 16 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2016
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3644.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2016
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3420.) (April 6).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2016
|
Set for hearing April 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2016
|
March 30 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2016
|
Set for hearing March 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|