California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1325 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 30, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2016

Amended

Bill August 18, 2016
Bill April 12, 2016