Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From Assembly without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
Died on the inactive file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2016
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Nazarian.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2016
|
June 20 set for first hearing. Placed on REV. & TAX. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 4109.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4008.) (May 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2016
|
Set for hearing May 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2016
|
May 16 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2016
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2016
|
May 9 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2016
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 3611.) (April 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2016
|
Set for hearing April 19 in JUD. pending receipt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3518.) (April 13).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2016
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2016
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|