Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From Assembly without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From committee without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2016
|
June 29 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2016
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 16). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
August 19 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2015
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 927.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
April 22 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2015
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 404.) (March 24). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2015
|
Set for hearing March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on G.O. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|