LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1330
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1330
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1330
Compare Versions
SB1330 Chaptered September 23, 2016
SB1330 Enrolled September 2, 2016
SB1330 Amended August 19, 2016
SB1330 Amended May 24, 2016
SB1330 Amended March 28, 2016
SB1330 Introduced February 19, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
SB1330 Chaptered September 23, 2016
SB1330 Enrolled September 2, 2016
SB1330 Amended August 19, 2016
SB1330 Amended May 24, 2016
SB1330 Amended March 28, 2016
SB1330 Introduced February 19, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare