California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1332 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill August 15, 2016
Bill August 1, 2016
Bill May 31, 2016
Bill April 12, 2016