California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1339 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill August 1, 2016
Bill June 30, 2016
Bill June 16, 2016
Bill May 31, 2016
Bill April 21, 2016
Bill April 11, 2016
Bill March 31, 2016
Bill March 28, 2016