California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1342 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill July 5, 2016

Chaptered

Bill July 25, 2016

Amended

Bill May 26, 2016
Bill April 12, 2016