LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1344
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SB1344
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1344
Action History
Senate
11/30/2016
From committee without further action.
Senate
04/13/2016
April 13 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 3. Page 3521.) Reconsideration granted.
Senate
04/05/2016
Set for hearing April 13.
Senate
03/03/2016
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
Senate
02/22/2016
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time.
Senate
02/19/2016
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.