Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From Assembly without further action. | ||
Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Assembly | 06/23/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2016 | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 05/26/2016 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/26/2016 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3956.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/17/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2016 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2016 | Set for hearing May 16. | ||
Senate | 04/19/2016 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2016 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3496.) (April 12). | ||
Senate | 03/24/2016 | Set for hearing April 12. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2016 | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2016 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |