Senate | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 05/27/2016 | May 27 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2016 | Set for hearing May 27. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2016 | May 16 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2016 | Set for hearing May 16. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2016 | May 9 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2016 | Set for hearing May 9. | ||
Senate | 04/19/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3590.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/12/2016 | Set for hearing April 19. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3419.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. | ||
Senate | 03/15/2016 | Set for hearing April 6. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2016 | Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and AGRI. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2016 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |