Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From Assembly without further action. | ||
Assembly | 11/30/2016 | Died at Desk. | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2016 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2016 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 1. Page 3801.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/27/2016 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3701.) (April 26). | ||
Senate | 04/14/2016 | Set for hearing April 26. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2016 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2016 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |