|
08/26/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 218, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4882.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/10/2016
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5721.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2016
|
Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3631.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2016
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2016
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3497.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2016
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2016
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|