LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1353
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1353
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1353
Compare Versions
SB1353 Chaptered September 14, 2016
SB1353 Enrolled August 26, 2016
SB1353 Amended June 8, 2016
SB1353 Amended March 28, 2016
SB1353 Introduced February 19, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
SB1353 Chaptered September 14, 2016
SB1353 Enrolled August 26, 2016
SB1353 Amended June 8, 2016
SB1353 Amended March 28, 2016
SB1353 Introduced February 19, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare