Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From Assembly without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From committee without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
August 11 hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2016
|
Referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4055.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4008.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
May 27 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2016
|
Set for hearing May 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3942.) (May 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. Joint Rule 61(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2016
|
Set for hearing May 24 in AGRI. pending receipt and suspension of rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2016
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|