Senate | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2016 | April 19 set for second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 4. Page 3614.) Reconsideration granted. | ||
Senate | 04/14/2016 | Set for hearing April 19. | ||
Senate | 04/13/2016 | April 12 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/15/2016 | Set for hearing April 12. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2016 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2016 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |