Senate | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2016 | April 20 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2016 | Set for hearing April 20. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 03/31/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2016 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2016 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |