California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1359 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 13, 2016

Amended

Bill August 1, 2016
Bill May 31, 2016
Bill April 12, 2016
Bill March 28, 2016