Senate | 02/01/2016 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2015 | April 29 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2015 | Set for hearing April 29. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2015 | March 18 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/06/2015 | Set for hearing March 18. | ||
Senate | 02/05/2015 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 01/23/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 22. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2015 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |