|
07/01/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 57, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2016
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5488.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2016
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3775.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3699.) (April 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2016
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2016
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|