Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From Assembly without further action. | ||
Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Assembly | 06/30/2016 | June 29 set for first hearing. Held in committee without recommendation. | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | ||
Assembly | 05/12/2016 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. | ||
Assembly | 05/03/2016 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2016 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3736.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2016 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/19/2016 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3518.) (April 13). | ||
Senate | 04/05/2016 | Set for hearing April 13. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2016 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2016 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |