Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From Assembly without further action. | ||
Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Assembly | 06/20/2016 | June 20 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 05/12/2016 | Referred to Com. on B. & F. | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2016 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2016 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3575.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2016 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3417.) (April 6). | ||
Senate | 04/01/2016 | Set for hearing April 6. | ||
Senate | 03/31/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I. | ||
Senate | 03/29/2016 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2016 | March 30 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2016 | Set for hearing March 30. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2016 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2016 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |