Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From Assembly without further action. | ||
Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Assembly | 08/24/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. | ||
Assembly | 08/19/2015 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 07/01/2015 | July 1 set for second hearing. Failed passage in committee. Reconsideration granted. | ||
Assembly | 06/17/2015 | June 17 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2015 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2015 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2015 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 483.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 03/26/2015 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 03/25/2015 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 417.) (March 25). | ||
Senate | 03/13/2015 | Set for hearing March 25. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 26. | ||
Senate | 01/26/2015 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |