Senate | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 04/13/2016 | April 13 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 4. Page 3517.) Reconsideration granted. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2016 | Set for hearing April 13. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2016 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2016 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2016 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |