|
09/23/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 545, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 5364.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 45. Noes 26. Page 5912.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 5.) (August 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2016
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 7. Page 3808.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3670.) (April 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2016
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3419.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2016
|
Set for hearing April 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2016
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|