Assembly
|
09/01/2016
|
From Assembly without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2016
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 30. Noes 36. Page 6599.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5960.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2016
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 13. Page 4065.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4009.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2016
|
Set for hearing May 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2016
|
May 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2016
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3644.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2016
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2016
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|