Senate | 11/30/2016 | Died on the inactive file. | ||
Senate | 06/02/2016 | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Monning. | ||
Senate | 06/02/2016 | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 19. Noes 17. Page 4152.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Huff. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4152.) | ||
Senate | 05/31/2016 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/27/2016 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 4009.) (May 27). | ||
Senate | 05/20/2016 | Set for hearing May 27. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2016 | May 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2016 | Set for hearing May 9. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2016 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2016 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 3617.) (April 19). | ||
Senate | 03/24/2016 | Set for hearing April 19. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2016 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2016 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |