Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From Assembly without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From committee without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2015
|
July 8 set for first hearing. Held in committee without recommendation.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2015
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 1247.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1148.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
April 27 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2015
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 544.) (April 8).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2015
|
Set for hearing April 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2015
|
March 25 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2015
|
Set for hearing March 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2015
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|