Senate | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 05/27/2016 | May 27 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2016 | Set for hearing May 27. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2016 | May 2 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2016 | Set for hearing May 2. | ||
Senate | 04/14/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3559.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/31/2016 | Set for hearing April 13. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 03/23/2016 | April 6 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/16/2016 | Set for hearing April 6. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2016 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2016 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |