California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1414 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill August 3, 2016
Bill August 1, 2016
Bill June 14, 2016
Bill April 12, 2016