California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1416 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 17, 2016

Chaptered

Bill August 26, 2016

Amended

Bill June 15, 2016
Bill May 23, 2016
Bill April 27, 2016
Bill March 28, 2016