Senate | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 05/27/2016 | May 27 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2016 | Set for hearing May 27. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2016 | April 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2016 | Set for hearing April 18. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3418.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/29/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2016 | Set for hearing April 6. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2016 | March 30 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2016 | Set for hearing March 30. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2016 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2016 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |