Senate | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2016 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | ||
Senate | 04/19/2016 | April 18 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2016 | Set for hearing April 18. | ||
Senate | 03/31/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2016 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2016 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |