Senate | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 05/27/2016 | May 27 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/24/2016 | Set for hearing May 27. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2016 | May 23 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2016 | Set for hearing May 23. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2016 | May 16 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2016 | Set for hearing May 16. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3615.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/13/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2016 | Set for hearing April 19. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3446.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 03/30/2016 | Set for hearing April 6. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2016 | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2016 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |