|
08/19/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 156, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/10/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2016
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5721.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3775.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3699.) (April 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2016
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2016
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|