California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1425 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 24, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill August 17, 2016
Bill August 1, 2016
Bill March 28, 2016