Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From Assembly without further action. | ||
Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Assembly | 06/30/2016 | June 30 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 06/22/2016 | June 22 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2016 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Assembly | 06/02/2016 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 06/01/2016 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 4110.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/31/2016 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/27/2016 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 4010.) (May 27). | ||
Senate | 05/20/2016 | Set for hearing May 27. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2016 | May 2 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2016 | Set for hearing May 2. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2016 | April 25 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2016 | Set for hearing April 25. | ||
Senate | 04/12/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3494.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/15/2016 | Set for hearing April 12. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2016 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |