Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From Assembly without further action. | ||
Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2016 | Referred to Com. on P. & C.P. | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2016 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/31/2016 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 4062.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2016 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2016 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 3767.) (May 3). | ||
Senate | 04/21/2016 | Set for hearing May 3. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2016 | April 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/14/2016 | Set for hearing April 26. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2016 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2016 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |