|
08/19/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 157, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/10/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2016
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5720.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2016
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3957.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3889.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2016
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3617.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2016
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2016
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|