Senate | 02/01/2016 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | April 15 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Set for hearing April 15. | ||
Senate | 03/16/2015 | March 18 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2015 | Set for hearing March 18. | ||
Senate | 02/05/2015 | Referred to Com. on E.Q. | ||
Senate | 01/28/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 27. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2015 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |